WebMar 1, 2024 · Brigadier General (Ret’d) Dr. Gyula Keszthelyi, President, Hungarian Military Logistic Association; Brigadier General Ilir Xhebexhia, Commander, Support Command, … WebAug 24, 2024 · South Atlantic Division. Brigadier General Daniel H. Hibner commissioned in 1993 from Kemper Military College. During his 29 years as a commissioned officer, he served in numerous command and staff positions in the United States and the Middle East and currently serves as the commander of the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, South …
The Soldier
Web12 rows · Oliver Charles Christopher Brown. Assistant Chief of Staff (Change Plans), … WebFeb 23, 2024 · The Chief of Staff of the Army announces the following officer assignments: Regular Army. Major General Peter B. Andrysiak, Jr., Commanding General, United States Army Alaska/Deputy Commander, United States Alaskan Command, Joint Base Elmendorf-Richardson, Alaska to Deputy Commanding General, United States Army Europe-Africa, … peopleconnect 2023
Recommendation for Award for Walter, Hugh Crosland Rank: Brigadier ...
WebJan 7, 2024 · Air Force Col. Tad D. Clark for appointment to the rank of brigadier general. Clark is currently serving as the senior executive officer to the vice chief of staff of the Air Force, Headquarters U ... WebMay 1, 1996 · Brig. Gen. Parker is a 1996 graduate of the U.S. Air Force Academy. Prior to becoming Chief of Staff, he deployed as Chief of Staff, Combined Joint Task Force-Operation Inherent Resolve, Union III Iraq. Brig. Gen. Parker commanded the 7th Bomb Wing, Dyess Air Force Base, Texas, and served as Vice Commander of the 2nd Bomb … WebBRIGADIER GENERAL ROBERT S. MACRUM. Retired July 01, 1959 Died November 03, 1980. LIEUTENANT GENERAL SAM MADDUX JR. Retired September 01, 1970 Died November 28, 1990. MAJOR GENERAL HAROLD R. MADDUX. Retired July 01, 1963 Died March 04, 2002. BRIGADIER GENERAL MICHAEL N. MADRID. people confused