Homi adi katgara
WebAuthorised Capital ₹28.05 cr; Paid Up Capital ₹3.78 cr; Sum of Charges-About. Eureka Forbes Ltd is an Amalgamated company established on 05 Feb 1931 with its office registered at Mumbai, Maharashtra, India and has been running since 92 years 2 months with a paid up capital of 3.78 cr. According to MCA records, 10 Directors and 2 … WebHomi Adi Katgara is on the board of Eureka Forbes Ltd. Homi Adi Katgara is on the board of Eureka Forbes Ltd. Ricerca avanzata Accedi. Password dimenticata? Ricorda . Oppure accedi con. Google Twitter Facebook ...
Homi adi katgara
Did you know?
WebHomi Adi Katgara is on the board of Eureka Forbes Ltd. Homi Adi Katgara is on the board of Eureka Forbes Ltd. Búsqueda avanzada Conéctate ¿Olvidó su contraseña? Recuerde . O Conectarse con. Google Twitter Facebook ... Homi Adi Katgara is on the board of Eureka Forbes Ltd. Current positions of Homi Adi Katgara : Name: Title: Since: Eureka Forbes Limited (Environmental Services & Equipment) Director: 2012: Homi Adi Katgara: Personal Network : Name: Linked companies: Sahil Dilip Dalal: Eureka Forbes Limited:
WebCrystal Complex Private Limited incorporated with MCA on 23 February 2007.The Crystal Complex Private Limited is listed in the class of pvtltd company and classified as Non Govt Company.This company is registered at Registrar of Companies(ROC). The company has 4 directors/key management personal Homi Adi Katgara, Sam Nariman Katgara, … WebHOMI ADI KATGARA. Director: 13 July 2005. View other directorships. Other Companies Associated with. Company: Designation: Appointment Date: JEENA SCRIPTECH ALPHA ADVISORS PRIVATELIMITED. Nominee Director. 07 December 2010. MSE FORWARDERS INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED. Director. 29 June 2006.
Web31 ott 2024 · Also, as per our records, its last balance sheet was prepared for the period ending on 31 March, 2024. Aviapro Logistic Services Private Limited has four directors - Homi Adi Katgara, Sam Nariman Katgara, and others. The Corporate Identification Number (CIN) of Aviapro Logistic Services Private Limited is … WebDirectors of Allport Cargo Private Limited are Homi Adi Katgara, Jehangir Nariman Katgara, Sam Nariman Katgara and Cyrus Nariman Katgara. Allport Cargo Private Limited's Corporate Identification Number is (CIN) U63013MH2007PTC167698 and its registration number is 167698.Its Email address is [email protected] and its …
WebHomi Adi Katgara is a mutual person. Vlcc Health Care Limited. Active 26 years 5 months . Gurveen Singh is a mutual person. Viyash Life Sciences Private Limited. Active 4 years 1 month . Gurveen Singh is a mutual person. Tuscan Ventures Private Limited. Active 15 years 7 months . Arvind Uppal is a mutual person.
Web26 apr 2024 · ''The Board has also considered and accepted the resignation of Homi Adi Katgara as Chairman of the Board with immediate effect, who will however continue to serve as an independent director on the Board,'' it said. ticksmith canadaWebHOMI ADI KATGARA bearing DIN: 00210338 is holding current directorship in 20 active Private or Public Limited Companies (Excluding LLPs). HOMI ADI KATGARA bearing DIN: 00210338 is not Disqualified by ROC u/s 164(2) and DIN is not deactivated due to non … the lost child recensioneWebMr. Homi Adi Katgara – Member; Mr. Vinod Rao - Member; CSR Policy. CSR Policy; CSR Projects approved by the Board For Financial Year 2024-21. Jal Daan – through Tandarust Bharat Foundation . Water Purifier. By Technology; RO + UV; RO; UV; Non-electric; By Features; Active Copper & Zinc; Alkaline Water; Hot Water; ticks medicationWeb2 mar 2024 · EUREKA FORBES LIMITED is a Private company incorporated on Wednesday, 26 November 2008. It is classified as Non-government company and is registered at Registrar of Companies, MUMBAI. Has authorized share capital of Rs.2,000,000,000 and has paid up capital of Rs.1,934,792,400. It is involved in Casting … the lost child questionsWebMse Forwarders India Private Limited is a 16 years 8 months old, private Indian Company, registered at Mumbai with a paid-up capital of Rs.3000000.0. Find details of its financials, directors, legal cases and charges. the lost child question answersWebHomi Adi Katgara: Director-2012: Mahesh Tahilyani Chelaram: Director-2024: Sahil Dilip Dalal: Non-Independent Non-Executive Director: 42: 2024: Arvind Uppal: Non-Independent Non-Executive Director: 60: 2024 the lost child quizWeb26 apr 2024 · ''The Board has also considered and accepted the resignation of Homi Adi Katgara as Chairman of the Board with immediate effect, who will however continue to serve as an independent director on the Board,'' it said. Lunolux Ltd is a special purpose vehicle incorporated by AI Global Investments ... the lost child q and a